NJ S3137 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4932
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "Electronic Construction Procurement Act." *
Title
The "Electronic Construction Procurement Act." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1308 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1308 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A1308 (2R) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1308 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3137 (3R)
A4932 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4932 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee