NJ S3127 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the authorities of the Rowan University-Rutgers Camden Board of Governors and authorizes Rowan University to participate in public-private partnerships.
Title
Revises the authorities of the Rowan University-Rutgers Camden Board of Governors and authorizes Rowan University to participate in public-private partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4589 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4589 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.227. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-23-1) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4589 (1R) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-7) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Sweeney) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4589 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S3127 (1R)