NJ S3123 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Approved P.L.2023, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Approved P.L.2023, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises goal for annual capacity of solar energy projects to be approved under Community Solar Energy Program; allows certain customers to self-attest to income for program participation; allows information disclosure of customers participating in program.
Title
Revises goal for annual capacity of solar energy projects to be approved under Community Solar Energy Program; allows certain customers to self-attest to income for program participation; allows information disclosure of customers participating in program.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4782 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4782 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.200. |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-5) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-26-0) |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A4782 (2R) |
2023-12-07 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Motion To Table Sa (22-15) (Ruiz) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Pennacchio) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4782 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S3123 (3R)