NJ S3119 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs NJ State Council on Arts to create and disseminate best practices guide for at-risk youth arts programs; requires council to assist government entities creating programs that adopt best practices.
Title
Directs NJ State Council on Arts to create and disseminate best practices guide for at-risk youth arts programs; requires council to assist government entities creating programs that adopt best practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4500 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4500 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.115.