NJ S3097 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A4159 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires BPU to regulate rates and terms and conditions of service of alternate operator telephone service providers to protect users of those services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires BPU to regulate rates and terms and conditions of service of alternate operator telephone service providers to protect users of those services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-13SenateSubstituted by A4159 (1R)
2014-01-09SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-12-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4159 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.278.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback