NJ S3087 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4564 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4564 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Voting Precinct Transparency Act;" requires filing of election district, county district, and municipal ward boundary data with Secretary of State for posting and download on official website with matching election results data.
Title
Establishes "Voting Precinct Transparency Act;" requires filing of election district, county district, and municipal ward boundary data with Secretary of State for posting and download on official website with matching election results data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4564 (2R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4564 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.487.