NJ S3081 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain former members of military reserve units to retain special license plates after conclusion of service.
Title
Allows certain former members of military reserve units to retain special license plates after conclusion of service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4298 |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4298 (Same As) 2023-03-28 - Approved P.L.2023, c.29.