NJ S3081 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.397.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.397.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals law concerning excess rates and charges for title insurance; makes agreement to use services of title or settlement service company subject to attorney review.
Title
Repeals law concerning excess rates and charges for title insurance; makes agreement to use services of title or settlement service company subject to attorney review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5219 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5219 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.397. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-1-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5219 (1R) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5219 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3081 (1R)