NJ S3075 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH to regulate and license embryo storage facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH to regulate and license embryo storage facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Waive Rule 23:4 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4605 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-3-0)
2019-08-27AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2019-08-26SenatePassed by the Senate (30-0)
2019-08-26SenateMotion Waive Rule 23:4 (30-0) (Weinberg)
2019-08-26Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (30-0)
2019-08-23SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-1-4)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A4605 (1R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4605 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S3075 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback