NJ S3072 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Sign Fabrication Safety Quality Assurance Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Sign Fabrication Safety Quality Assurance Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5018 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.84.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-1-1)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A5018 (2R)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5018 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3072 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback