NJ S3071 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires law enforcement provide victim of sexual assault with intial incident report; provides victim with option to review intial incident report and submit corrective form.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires law enforcement provide victim of sexual assault with intial incident report; provides victim with option to review intial incident report and submit corrective form.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4885 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
2021-03-01AssemblySubstituted for A4885 (1R)
2021-02-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-02-22AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2020-12-17AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2020-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4885 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3071 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback