NJ S3071 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by A3666

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A3666 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public works contractors to have certain certifications; requires certain contractors to participate in apprenticeship program.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public works contractors to have certain certifications; requires certain contractors to participate in apprenticeship program.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted by A3666 (ACS/1R)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3666 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.21.
A3666 (Replaced by) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.21.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback