NJ S3070 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Sexual Violence Restorative Justice Pilot Program."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Sexual Violence Restorative Justice Pilot Program."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-02-22AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2020-12-17AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2020-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4884 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback