NJ S307 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2520
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Veterans Diversion Program to divert eligible servicemembers away from criminal justice system and into appropriate case management and mental health services.**
Title
Creates Veterans Diversion Program to divert eligible servicemembers away from criminal justice system and into appropriate case management and mental health services.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4362 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4362 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.42. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A4362 (2R) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2520 (Carry Over) 2014-12-15 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4362 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S307 (SCS/2R)
A4362 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S307 (SCS/2R)