NJ S3067 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.419.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.419.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes five year Apprentice Assistance and Support Services Pilot Program.
Title
Establishes five year Apprentice Assistance and Support Services Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4602 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.419. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-9-2) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4602 (1R) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4602 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3067 (2R)