NJ S3052 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-23-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-23-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Small Business Loan Program in EDA allowing certain small businesses to be eligible for low interest rate loans of up to $250,000 to expand their businesses.
Title
Establishes Small Business Loan Program in EDA allowing certain small businesses to be eligible for low interest rate loans of up to $250,000 to expand their businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-23-3) | |
2011-12-05 | Substituted for A4336 | |
2011-12-01 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-21 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-11-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-26 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-09-22 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-09-19 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-09-19 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-09-19 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4336 (Same As) 2011-12-05 - Substituted by S3052