NJ S3046 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5451
Note: Carry Over of previous S4035
Note: Carry Over of previous S4035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business and gross income tax credit for employment of persons who have experienced job loss due to automation.
Title
Provides corporation business and gross income tax credit for employment of persons who have experienced job loss due to automation.
Sponsors
Sen. Owen Henry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1258 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A5451 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S4035 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A5451 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S4035 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3046 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3046_I1.HTM |