NJ S3040 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers management of PFRS to Board of Trustees of PFRS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers management of PFRS to Board of Trustees of PFRS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A99 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2017-03-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-4-11)
2017-03-23AssemblyMotion To Table (Voice) (Greenwald)
2017-03-23AssemblyMotion To Recommit to AAP (Auth)
2017-03-23AssemblySubstituted for A99
2017-03-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-03-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-03-13SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-03-13SenateEmergency Resolution (37-0) (Kean)
2017-03-13SenateSenate Amendment (34-0) (Sweeney)
2017-03-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-03-06SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A99 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S3040 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback