NJ S3029 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4430/4555 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4430/4555 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Linda's Law"; prohibits electric public utilities from discontinuing service to customers using life-sustaining equipment with verification of use of equipment.
Title
"Linda's Law"; prohibits electric public utilities from discontinuing service to customers using life-sustaining equipment with verification of use of equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A4430/4555 (ACS/1R) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Vitale) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4430 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.154.