NJ S3029 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Volkswagen Settlement Utilization Fund for Motor Vehicle Emissions Reduction and Air Pollution Control"; directs DEP to use moneys in fund to establish and implement certain air pollution control programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Volkswagen Settlement Utilization Fund for Motor Vehicle Emissions Reduction and Air Pollution Control"; directs DEP to use moneys in fund to establish and implement certain air pollution control programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-04AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2017-06-19SenatePassed by the Senate (26-8)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-05-01SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-05-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4749 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback