NJ S3022 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $88,592,361 from "Garden State Green Acres Preservation Trust Fund" and various Green Acres bond funds for local government open space acquisition and park development projects.
Title
Appropriates $88,592,361 from "Garden State Green Acres Preservation Trust Fund" and various Green Acres bond funds for local government open space acquisition and park development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4559 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4559 (Same As) 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.105.