NJ S2998 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires creditors to make certain disclosures regarding collateral protection insurance to consumer debtors.*
Title
Requires creditors to make certain disclosures regarding collateral protection insurance to consumer debtors.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5323 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in House Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5323 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in House Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.312. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Concur by Senate Amendments (36-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A5323 (2R) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5323 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2998 (3R)