NJ S2996 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.221.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.221.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns eligibility for certain leave and benefit programs.
Title
Concerns eligibility for certain leave and benefit programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.221. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-2-2) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A4527 |
2013-12-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4527 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2996