NJ S2988 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4584 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4584 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $7,500,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for planning incentive grants to municipalities for farmland preservation purposes.
Title
Appropriates $7,500,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for planning incentive grants to municipalities for farmland preservation purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4584 (1R) |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4584 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.226.