NJ S2978 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits local units and school districts to invest in local government investment pools managed in accordance with applicable Governmental Accounting Standards Board guidelines.
Title
Permits local units and school districts to invest in local government investment pools managed in accordance with applicable Governmental Accounting Standards Board guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4404 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4404 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A4404 (1R) |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-3) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4404 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2978 (1R)