NJ S2977 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act"; provides funding to small food retailers to sell fresh and nutritious food; appropriates $1 million.
Title
"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act"; provides funding to small food retailers to sell fresh and nutritious food; appropriates $1 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A4496 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4496 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly