NJ S2952 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S585
Note: Carry Over of previous A3082
Note: Carry Over of previous A3082
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJT to remove snow from certain stops, stations, and stands for motorbus regular route service and to make name and contact information of entities responsible for snow removal publicly available.
Title
Requires NJT to remove snow from certain stops, stations, and stands for motorbus regular route service and to make name and contact information of entities responsible for snow removal publicly available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2952 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2363 (Same As) 2017-01-19 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3082 (Carry Over) 2014-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2363 (Same As) 2017-01-19 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3082 (Carry Over) 2014-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee