NJ S2946 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1858
Note: Carry Foward to future A4599
Note: Carry Over of previous A3066
Note: Carry Foward to future A4599
Note: Carry Over of previous A3066
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to study technology and other methods used to reduce or eliminate telemarketing harassment and intimidation.
Title
Establishes task force to study technology and other methods used to reduce or eliminate telemarketing harassment and intimidation.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2946 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2946 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3492 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3066 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2946 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3492 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3066 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee