NJ S2943 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits use of campaign funds to pay for child care expenses when incurred as direct result of campaign activity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits use of campaign funds to pay for child care expenses when incurred as direct result of campaign activity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (34-3)
2018-12-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4507 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback