NJ S2937 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various changes to pension and health care benefits for public employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes to pension and health care benefits for public employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 45 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-28 Approved P.L.2011, c.78.
2011-06-23 Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-32-0)
2011-06-23 Motion To Table (Burzichelli) (45-32-0)
2011-06-23 Motion To Aa (O'Donnell)
2011-06-23 Substituted for A4133
2011-06-20 Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2011-06-20 Passed by the Senate (24-15)
2011-06-16 Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2011-06-13 Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4133 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S2937

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback