NJ S2920 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes funding allocations for constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for Fiscal Year 2020 and thereafter and revises law for State's open space, farmland preservation programs; appropriates $500,000.*
Title
Establishes funding allocations for constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for Fiscal Year 2020 and thereafter and revises law for State's open space, farmland preservation programs; appropriates $500,000.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4477 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.136. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4477 (ACS) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4477 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2920 (2R)