NJ S2917 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.46.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands allowance for developers to carry forward unused tax credits under New Jersey Aspire Program.
Title
Expands allowance for developers to carry forward unused tax credits under New Jersey Aspire Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4395 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4395 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.46. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-1-0) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4395 |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4395 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2917