NJ S2914 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires suspension of school bus endorsement on driver's license for certain number of motor vehicle moving violations in certain time period.
Title
Requires suspension of school bus endorsement on driver's license for certain number of motor vehicle moving violations in certain time period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4447 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.9. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4447 (1R) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tully) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (35-0) (Lagana) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4447 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2914 (2R)