NJ S2891 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3099
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4134 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4134 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Secure Choice Savings Program Act"; establishes retirement savings program for certain workers; establishes standard contribution level of 3 percent.*
Title
"New Jersey Secure Choice Savings Program Act"; establishes retirement savings program for certain workers; establishes standard contribution level of 3 percent.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4134 (2R) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3099 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4134 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.56.
A4134 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.56.