NJ S2890 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Pending: Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Pending: Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $2.561 million supplemental appropriation for increased aid to Liberty Science Center.
Title
Makes $2.561 million supplemental appropriation for increased aid to Liberty Science Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4338 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee