NJ S2877 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S959
Note: Carry Foward to future A3514
Note: Carry Over of previous A4026
Note: Carry Foward to future A3514
Note: Carry Over of previous A4026
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Caregiver Task Force to evaluate and provide recommendations on caregiver support services.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Caregiver Task Force to evaluate and provide recommendations on caregiver support services.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2877 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2877 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1463 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4026 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2640
S2877 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1463 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4026 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2640