NJ S2875 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.252.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.252.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain restrictions on ownership of medical cannabis alternative treatment centers; expands scope of review of alternative treatment center permit applications and related materials.
Title
Revises certain restrictions on ownership of medical cannabis alternative treatment centers; expands scope of review of alternative treatment center permit applications and related materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.252. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4) |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-5-2) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5179 (2R) |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Health Committee |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-8) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4926 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A5179 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S2875 (3R)
A5179 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S2875 (3R)