NJ S2866 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.30.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Elections Transparency Act;" requires reporting of campaign contributions in excess of $200; increases contribution limits; concerns independent expenditure committees, certain business entity contributions, and certain local provisions; requires appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Elections Transparency Act;" requires reporting of campaign contributions in excess of $200; increases contribution limits; concerns independent expenditure committees, certain business entity contributions, and certain local provisions; requires appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4372 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-03SenateApproved P.L.2023, c.30.
2023-03-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-12)
2023-03-30SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2023-03-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (45-31-0)
2023-03-30AssemblyMotion To Table Motion(42-31-0)(Greenwald)
2023-03-30AssemblyMotion To Table Bill (Bergen)
2023-03-30AssemblySubstituted for A4372 (ACS/1R)
2023-03-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-03-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2023-03-20SenatePassed by the Senate (24-12)
2023-03-16SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-03-16SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2023-02-23SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2023-02-16SenateRecommitted to Senate Judiciary Committee
2022-06-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-06-27SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2022-06-23SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-06-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4372 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Substituted by S2866 (SCS/2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2866
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_I1.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_I2.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_R1.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_R2.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_U1.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_R1a.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_R2a.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/AL23/30_.HTM
Texthttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/PL23/30_.HTM
Supplementhttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_S1.PDF
Supplementhttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_S2.PDF
Supplementhttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_S3.PDF
Supplementhttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_S4.PDF
Supplementhttps://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2866_S5.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2866

Bill Comments

feedback