NJ S2866 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4196 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4196 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies and revises certain aspects of the "Hackensack Meadowlands Agency Consolidation Act."
Title
Clarifies and revises certain aspects of the "Hackensack Meadowlands Agency Consolidation Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4196 (3R) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4196 (Same As) 2015-07-06 - Approved P.L.2015, c.72.