NJ S2861 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.222.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health curriculum for public school students in grades kindergarten through 12 to include instruction on mental health.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health curriculum for public school students in grades kindergarten through 12 to include instruction on mental health.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4446 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.222.
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4446/4592 (ACS)
2019-06-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2019-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-08-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4446 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2861/3081 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback