NJ S2850 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires board of education or school bus contractor, within one business day of notification that school bus driver's license is suspended or revoked, to verify to DOE that driver is no longer operating school bus. *
Title
Requires board of education or school bus contractor, within one business day of notification that school bus driver's license is suspended or revoked, to verify to DOE that driver is no longer operating school bus. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4344 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.152. |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4344 (1R) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (36-0) (Lagana) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4344 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2850 (1R)