NJ S2844 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S633
Note: Carry Foward to future A2567
Note: Carry Foward to future A2567
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts and DOE to post on their websites information regarding student participation in certain assessments.*
Title
Requires school districts and DOE to post on their websites information regarding student participation in certain assessments.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2844 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2844 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4562 (Same As) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2844 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4562 (Same As) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading