NJ S2843 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1364
Note: Carry Over of previous A5007
Note: Carry Over of previous S4033
Note: Carry Over of previous A5007
Note: Carry Over of previous S4033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes measures to provide employment stability for high school coaches employed in school districts.
Title
Establishes measures to provide employment stability for high school coaches employed in school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2843 (Carry Over) 2020-08-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1911 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5007 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4033 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1911 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5007 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4033 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee