NJ S2834 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.311.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.311.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates training on culturally responsive teaching for all candidates for teaching certification.
Title
Mandates training on culturally responsive teaching for all candidates for teaching certification.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5312 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5312 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.311. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-18-2) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-6) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (30-1) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (58-11-3) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A5312 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-7) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5312 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2834