NJ S2829 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Approved P.L.2011, c.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Pamela's Law;" criminalizes possession and sale of mephedrone and methylenedioxpyrovalerone, commonly known as MDPV or "bath salts."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Pamela's Law;" criminalizes possession and sale of mephedrone and methylenedioxpyrovalerone, commonly known as MDPV or "bath salts."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-22 Approved P.L.2011, c.120.
2011-06-29 Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-2-0)
2011-06-29 Substituted for A3984 (ACS)
2011-06-16 Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2011-06-13 Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2011-06-09 Passed by the Senate (37-0)
2011-06-02 Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2011-04-11 Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3984 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by S2829 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback