NJ S2827 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1659
Note: Carry Foward to future A3943
Note: Carry Foward to future A3943
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires teachers to biennially complete two hours of professional development related to cultural competence.
Title
Requires teachers to biennially complete two hours of professional development related to cultural competence.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-10) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2827 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2827 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5313 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2827 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5313 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee