NJ S2826 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.224.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Directs DOE to establish five-year pilot program for issuance of limited certificate of eligibility with advanced standing and limited certificate of eligibility for certain teacher candidates.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs DOE to establish five-year pilot program for issuance of limited certificate of eligibility with advanced standing and limited certificate of eligibility for certain teacher candidates.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4594 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.224.
2021-06-21AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-5-1)
2021-06-21AssemblySubstituted for A4594 (1R)
2021-06-09AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-09AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2021-06-03SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2021-03-25SenateSenate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
2021-01-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-08-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4594 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2826 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback