NJ S2816 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1014
Note: Carry Foward to future A2407
Note: Carry Foward to future A2407
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes composition of State Employment and Training Commission.
Title
Changes composition of State Employment and Training Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A4357 (1R) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2816 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)
S2816 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)
A4357 (Same As) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S2816 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)
A4357 (Same As) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence