NJ S2814 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4373
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires HMFA to post proposed rules, regulations, policies,and underwriting criteria on its Internet website.*
Title
Requires HMFA to post proposed rules, regulations, policies,and underwriting criteria on its Internet website.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2039 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A4373 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A4373 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee