NJ S2804 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S59
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds two public members to NJT board.
Title
Adds two public members to NJT board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Lesniak) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2804 (Carry Over) 2015-07-23 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak)
A4303 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4303 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee